Global Patent Index - EP 0744343 B1

EP 0744343 B1 2000-08-16 - Tensioning and fixing device for tying an object with a plastic tape

Title (en)

Tensioning and fixing device for tying an object with a plastic tape

Title (de)

Spann- und Verschliessvorrichtung zum Umreifen eines Gegenstandes mit einem Kunststoffband

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise sous tension et de fixation pour le cerclage d'un objet avec un lien en matière plastique

Publication

EP 0744343 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108154 A

Priority

CH 157095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744343A1] The clamping unit (3) has a pivot mounted clamping shoe (5) and a clamping wheel driven by an electric or compressed air motor (8) and fixed to a pivoting rocker arm (6) whose pivot axle is positioned between one support surface (10) of the clamping shoe and a base plate (2). The support surface is movably mounted so that it is pressed against the clamping wheel when the clamping wheel is turned. The clamping shoe and rocker arm share the same pivot axle. The clamping shoe has a slide piece which is movable along an at least partly sloping surface of a holder. The holder has two guide pieces (17,19) for the bottom and top ends respectively of the strap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/22 (2006.01); B65B 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 13/327 (2013.01); B65B 13/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744343 A1 19961127; EP 0744343 B1 20000816; AT 195476 T 20000915; DE 59605745 D1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605745

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE KLEIN & KLEIN

2004-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040522

2004-05-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ORGAPACK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020606

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605745 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195476 T 20000915

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORGAPACK GMBH

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL