Global Patent Index - EP 0744365 B1

EP 0744365 B1 2000-03-22 - Method for changing the roll in a winding machine and winding machine for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for changing the roll in a winding machine and winding machine for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Rollenwechsel in einer Wickelmaschine und zum Durchführen des Verfahrens geeignete Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour changer le rouleau dans une machine à enrouler et machine à enrouler pour l'application de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0744365 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108161 A

Priority

DE 19519306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744365A2] The reel changing system has the paper web (3) passed around a carrier roller (1) before feeding onto the winding reel (3.1), with the carrier roller rotated in synchronism with the winding reel during the normal winding and during a creep rotation rate, initiated shortly before the required winding reel dia. is reached. A weakness line is provided across the width of the web and coated with an adhesive during the creep rotation rate, with subsequent adhering of the web to the wound reel and separation of the web along the weakness line, before removal of the completed wound reel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/26; B65H 19/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/26 (2006.01); B65H 19/29 (2006.01); B65H 23/195 (2006.01); D21F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/267 (2013.01); B65H 19/29 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41426 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414421 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2406/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/14 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/14 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744365 A2 19961127; EP 0744365 A3 19961218; EP 0744365 B1 20000322; AT 190961 T 20000415; AU 5248096 A 19961205; BR 9601721 A 19980331; CA 2177314 A1 19961127; DE 19519306 A1 19961128; JP 3062993 B2 20000712; JP H09118459 A 19970506; US 5845866 A 19981208

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150522

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-06-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030610

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010518

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-12-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604721

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190961

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970516

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970411

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI SE