Global Patent Index - EP 0744373 B1

EP 0744373 B1 2001-05-30 - Operating device for elevator door

Title (en)

Operating device for elevator door

Title (de)

Betätigungsvorrichtung für eine Aufzugtürkombination

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'actionnement pour porte d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0744373 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108029 A

Priority

DE 29508499 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744373A2] The operating device includes a drive (7,17) and a carrier (35,39). There is also a counter-carrier (65,73). The drive is connected by a coupling (29) to one door and to the carrier so that the carrier covers the clearance to grip the counter-carrier before the first door begins to open. The coupling device may be pivoted to the drive and one door. There may be two turning axes, one between the drive and the coupling, and the other between the coupling and the door. They move along a line orthogonal to the motion of the doors while the clearance is being overcome.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 13/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508499 U1 19960926; AT 201653 T 20010615; EP 0744373 A2 19961127; EP 0744373 A3 19970122; EP 0744373 B1 20010530; HU 9601373 A1 19970228; HU 9601373 D0 19960729

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606980

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140520

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201653 T

- Effective date: 20140520

2014-12-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141201

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MEILLER AUFZUGTUEREN GMBH

- Free text: MEILLER AUFZUGTUEREN GMBH#UNTERMENZINGER STR. 1#80997 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MEILLER AUFZUGTUEREN GMBH#UNTERMENZINGER STR. 1#80997 MUENCHEN (DE)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606980 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201653 T 20010615

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEILLER AUFZUGTUEREN GMBH

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991217

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970721

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI NL