Global Patent Index - EP 0744376 B1

EP 0744376 B1 2000-04-05 - Process for making a saddle tree and tree so obtained

Title (en)

Process for making a saddle tree and tree so obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Sattelbaums und so hergestellter Sattelbaum

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un arçon de selle et arçon réalisé

Publication

EP 0744376 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401044 A

Priority

FR 9506178 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744376A1] The saddle frame has a pommel (1) at its leading end, and a pair of lateral support strips (2), all formed from a composite material. The composite consists of at least one layer of wood at each of the upper and lower surfaces, with at least one intermediate layer of wood in between. The layers of wood are separated by layers of natural or synthetic fibrous material, e.g. carbon fibre or resin material. The lower edges (12) of the pommel are connected to the lateral support strips by L-shaped metal reinforcing brackets (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68C 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744376 A1 19961127; EP 0744376 B1 20000405; DE 69607515 D1 20000511; DE 69607515 T2 20010111; FR 2734558 A1 19961129; FR 2734558 B1 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160513

2016-06-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160513

2016-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-05-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607515

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: L'ARCONNERIE

- Free text: L'ARCONNERIE#ZI DES TERRES NOIRES#81370 SAINT SULPICE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- L'ARCONNERIE#ZI DES TERRES NOIRES#81370 SAINT SULPICE (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'ARCONNERIE

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607515 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

1997-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970102

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI