Global Patent Index - EP 0744478 B1

EP 0744478 B1 2000-05-31 - Foreign fiber detection in an opening machine

Title (en)

Foreign fiber detection in an opening machine

Title (de)

Fremdfaserdetektion an einer Öffnungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Détection de fibres étrangères dans une machine d'ouverture

Publication

EP 0744478 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104099 A

Priority

DE 19518783 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744478A1] An installation is for detecting differently coloured fibres, films or fabrics in fibre opening lines. It features sensors (S) located opposite the surface of an opening roll (W), across the working width of the roll (W). If the sensors (S) and the evaluation electronics establish a clear colour deviation compared to the normal fibre in the opened material, the fibre current is sluiced out of the normal fibre opening line wholly or partially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 9/12 (2006.01); D01G 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 31/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744478 A1 19961127; EP 0744478 B1 20000531; DE 19518783 A1 19961128; DE 19518783 B4 20090409; DE 59605344 D1 20000706; IN 188165 B 20020831; JP H093728 A 19970107; TR 9600366 A2 19961221

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605344

2015-05-28 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59605344

- Effective date: 20141028

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-28 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59605344

2014-10-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59605344

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010307

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-27 [K2C3] CORRECTION OF PATENT SPECIFICATION (COMPLETE REPRINT) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-08-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HERGETH, HUBERT A.

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605344 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970311

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI