Global Patent Index - EP 0744496 B1

EP 0744496 B1 2000-01-05 - Noise reducer for wayside acoustical barriers

Title (en)

Noise reducer for wayside acoustical barriers

Title (de)

Bahnseitige Lärmreduziereinrichtung für Lärmschutzwände

Title (fr)

Réducteur du bruit pour mur anti-bruit routier

Publication

EP 0744496 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201207 A

Priority

IT TO950400 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744496A1] The noise reducer comprises tubular members such as spiral tubes (18), or tubes made of two half-shells (22, 24; 26, 28; 40), having at least partially perforated walls and internally lined with a sound-absorbing material (25; 36), and longitudinally fastened to the top of the barrier. A sound-reflector tube (44) may be nested within each tubular member (40). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/007 (2013.01); E01F 8/0035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744496 A1 19961127; EP 0744496 B1 20000105; AT 188524 T 20000115; DE 69605974 D1 20000210; ES 2143712 T3 20000516; IT 1279551 B1 19971216; IT TO950400 A1 19961122; IT TO950400 D0 19950522

INPADOC legal status


2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100502

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 13

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-06-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2000-06-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRUPPO RUSCALLA S.P.A.

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143712 T3

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-04-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-04-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69605974 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188524 T 20000115

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980911

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970519

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB LI NL SE