Global Patent Index - EP 0744505 B1

EP 0744505 B1 2000-07-26 - Roof balcony or the like

Title (en)

Roof balcony or the like

Title (de)

Dachbalkon oder dergl.

Title (fr)

Balcon de toit ou similaire

Publication

EP 0744505 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107375 A

Priority

DE 29508649 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ289142B6] At least a partially prefabricated roof balcony has a floor element (1.4) and at least four wall elements (1.1, 1.3) the outer surfaces of which form an integral plastic weather shell (1). A room-side shell of individual supporting plates (2) of fibber-reinforced inorganic and/or organic material is provided at least in the area of the wall elements (1.1, 1,3) and is spaced from the weather shell (4) by hollow plastics profiled sections (4). A damp course layer (3) is placed on the weather-side faces of these plates (2). The intermediate spaces between the plastic profiled sections are fitted with heat-insulating plates (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00; E04B 7/18; E04G 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01); E04B 7/18 (2006.01); E04D 11/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/04 (2006.01); E04D 13/158 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01); E04G 23/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0477 (2013.01); E04D 11/00 (2013.01); E04D 13/1585 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508649 U1 19950810; AT 195012 T 20000815; CZ 289142 B6 20011114; CZ 9601495 A3 19961211; DK 0744505 T3 20001016; EP 0744505 A1 19961127; EP 0744505 B1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050509

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030509

2002-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 26.02.2002 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2002-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WANIT FULGURIT G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605634

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195012

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WANIT FULGURIT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981216

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR IT LI NL