Global Patent Index - EP 0744517 B1

EP 0744517 B1 2001-02-28 - Improved lock with flat tumblers and changeable combination

Title (en)

Improved lock with flat tumblers and changeable combination

Title (de)

Schloss mit flachen Zuhaltungen und Wechselkombination

Title (fr)

Serrure avec des gâchettes plattes et une combinaison modifiable

Publication

EP 0744517 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96107783 A

Priority

IT BO950266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744517A2] The lock comprises tumblers (17), each composed of two parts (18,19) that are provided with mutually opposite sets of teeth (24,25) that can be coupled to each other frontally. By means of a change key (C,C1), the sets of teeth (24,25) are arranged according to a new combination that matches the combination of the new actuation key. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 35/08; E05B 35/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 35/12 (2006.01); E05B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 21/00 (2013.01); E05B 35/125 (2013.01); E05B 15/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744517 A2 19961127; EP 0744517 A3 19980408; EP 0744517 B1 20010228; ES 2155549 T3 20010516; GR 3035921 T3 20010831; IT 1279602 B1 19971216; IT BO950266 A1 19961126; IT BO950266 D0 19950526; PT 744517 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140516

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20010400776

- Effective date: 20141203

2015-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141117

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141203

2014-11-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20141117

2013-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130411

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155549 T3

2001-04-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CISA S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GR PT

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000516

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-04-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES GR PT

1998-03-11 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 35/08

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES GR PT