Global Patent Index - EP 0744521 B1

EP 0744521 B1 2001-03-28 - Hinge with movable axis of rotation in particular for the panel-finished doors of built-in dish washing machines

Title (en)

Hinge with movable axis of rotation in particular for the panel-finished doors of built-in dish washing machines

Title (de)

Scharnier mit beweglicher Rotationsachse, insbesondere für mit einem Paneel fertigbearbeiteten Türen von eingebauten Geschirrspülmaschinen

Title (fr)

Charnière avec axe de rotation mobile, en particulier pour portes avec panneau de finition pour lave-vaisselle encastrés

Publication

EP 0744521 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201360 A

Priority

IT MI950343 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744521A1] Hinge with a movable axis of rotation, in particular for the panel-lined doors of built-in dish washing machines, comprising a fixed plate (1) attached to the dish washer and an arm (9) attached to the door thereof and rotating about a movable pin (7) attached to the free end (5b) of a first lever (5), the other end (5a) of which is hinged on a fixed pin (3) attached to the plate (1), there also being provided a second lever (6), the opposite ends of which are hinged, respectively, on a pin (8) attached to the arm (9) and on a fixed pin (4) attached to the plate (1), said combination being designed to make the pin (7) and hence the arm (9) carrying the dish-washer door follow a curved trajectory. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06; A47L 15/42; F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 3/18 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/14 (2013.01); A47L 15/4261 (2013.01); F24C 15/023 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/304 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/308 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/312 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744521 A1 19961127; EP 0744521 B1 20010328; DE 69612233 D1 20010503; DE 69612233 T2 20011011; IT 236891 Y1 20000831; IT MI950343 U1 19961125; IT MI950343 V0 19950523

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69612233

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140521

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. ALFREDO RAIMONDI

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612233 20010503

2001-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FARINGOSI HINGES S.R.L.

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FARINGOSI HINGES S.R.L.

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990816

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970519

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT