Global Patent Index - EP 0744522 B1

EP 0744522 B1 2000-06-28 - Clip-on support shaft for pulley

Title (en)

Clip-on support shaft for pulley

Title (de)

Einrastbarer Stützschaft für Seilrollen

Title (fr)

Arbre de support à pince pour poulie

Publication

EP 0744522 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96500064 A

Priority

ES 9500982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744522A1] A clip-on support shaft for a pulley used in automobile vehicle window winders. The support shaft (10) is a part in the shape of a pan or bowl, provided with a perimetral ledge (23) that controls a wheel (9) arranged on its upper surface. The base of the bowl is occupied by a set of legs (1,2,3,4) and an auxiliary part (5) in an annex to the support-shaft. These legs become housed on the edges of windows (14,15,16) cut in the profile (II). The base also has a flexible tongue (6) which fits into one wall (12) of the profile (II). The support shaft is fixed to the profile by being clipped directly onto it. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/483 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/654 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/662 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/668 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/706 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/52 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/528 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/60 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/626 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/45 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/692 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744522 A1 19961127; EP 0744522 B1 20000628; DE 69609015 D1 20000803; DE 69609015 T2 20010322; ES 2122872 A1 19981216; ES 2122872 B1 19990816; ES 2148712 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050524

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2005-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-05-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050523

2004-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040405

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148712 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609015 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GRUPO ANTOLIN-INGENIERIA, S.A.

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970520

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT