Global Patent Index - EP 0744524 B1

EP 0744524 B1 2001-12-12 - Device for the electronic control of the movements of a roller shutter

Title (en)

Device for the electronic control of the movements of a roller shutter

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur elektronischen Steuerung der Bewegungen eines Rolladens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la commande électronique de mouvements d'un volet à rouleau

Publication

EP 0744524 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105397 A

Priority

DE 19519020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744524A2] The control device (14) is coupled to a switching device (S1,S2), for rotation of the electric drive motor (10) for the shutter (11) in either direction, for raising or lowering the shutter respectively, with a memory storing each end position of the roller shutter for automatic cut-out of the drive motor. The memory holds at least one further intermediate roller shutter position, selected by a defined operating sequence or continuous operation of the switching device and identified by the electronic control device for automatic cut-out of the motor upon reaching the intermediate position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2006.01); E06B 9/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2013.01); E06B 2009/6872 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744524 A2 19961127; EP 0744524 A3 19970205; EP 0744524 B1 20011212; AT 210779 T 20011215; DE 19519020 A1 19961128; ES 2164798 T3 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140405

2015-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150526

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140404

2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608408

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608408

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210779 T

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-06-14 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20060130

2003-01-06 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ERNST SELVE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ERNST SELVE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2164798 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608408 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210779 T 20011215

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010427

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMFY FEINMECHANIK UND ELEKTROTECHNIK GMBH

1998-03-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980109

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL