Global Patent Index - EP 0744582 B1

EP 0744582 B1 2000-02-23 - Safety device preventing the return of combustion gases in bath heaters or gas-fired boilers

Title (en)

Safety device preventing the return of combustion gases in bath heaters or gas-fired boilers

Title (de)

Sicherheitsgerät bei Rückstrom der Abgase von Gasheizern und -Kesseln

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité contre le refoulement des produits de combustion dans les chauffe-bains et chaudières à gaz

Publication

EP 0744582 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401115 A

Priority

FR 9506243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744582A1] The device comprises a heat sensitive element (10). This sensor detects the flow back of combustion products from the outlet flow in the apparatus draw chimney (3). The heat sensor is positioned outside the chimney behind the apparatus at the level of an opening (8) in the rear face (9). Fresh air normally is induced in this region. The opening is in the extension of a central diverter (7) located inside the chimney casing directly below the exhaust gas duct (4). The central diverter has the shape of a longitudinal small dish whose concavity is upwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744582 A1 19961127; EP 0744582 B1 20000223; AT 189922 T 20000315; DE 69606735 D1 20000330; DE 69606735 T2 20000928; ES 2145397 T3 20000701; FR 2734626 A1 19961129; FR 2734626 B1 19970801

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070524

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070524

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070523

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SAUNIER DUVAL EAU CHAUDE CHAUFFAGE *SDECC

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145397 T3

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606735 20000330

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189922 T 20000315

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980715

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970417

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL