Global Patent Index - EP 0744674 A3

EP 0744674 A3 2000-03-29 - Electronic apparatus with vibration informing function

Title (en)

Electronic apparatus with vibration informing function

Title (de)

Elektronische Vorrichtung mit einer mittels Schwingungen ausgeführten Informationsfunktion

Title (fr)

Dispositif électronique comportant une fonction information réalisée au moyen de virbations

Publication

EP 0744674 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96303628 A

Priority

JP 12793595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744674A2] An electronic apparatus with a vibration informing function is disclosed. When conditions for providing an alarm are satisfied, a vibration informing control circuit (102) outputs a vibration informing ON signal to a vibrating means control circuit (103). The vibrating means control circuit (103) intermittently drives and stops a vibrating means (105) via a vibration means driving circuit (104). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 25/04; G08B 6/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 25/04 (2006.01); G04G 99/00 (2010.01); G08B 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 6/00 (2013.01); G04B 25/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744674 A2 19961127; EP 0744674 A3 20000329; EP 0744674 B1 20040804; CN 1080899 C 20020313; CN 1140845 A 19970122; DE 69633037 D1 20040909; DE 69633037 T2 20041209; JP 3084392 B2 20000904; JP H08320384 A 19961203

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130521

2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69633037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130521

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-06-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1008354

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69633037

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030321

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 04B 25/04 A, 7G 08B 6/00 B

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI