Global Patent Index - EP 0744723 B1

EP 0744723 B1 2000-06-21 - Method and device for receiving signals from a plurality of transmitters

Title (en)

Method and device for receiving signals from a plurality of transmitters

Title (de)

Verfahren und Anordnung zum Empfang von Signalen von verschiedenen Sendern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de réception de signaux issus d'une pluralité d'émetteurs

Publication

EP 0744723 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401043 A

Priority

  • FR 9506110 A
  • US 64594996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0744723A1] The signal separation method takes signals arriving from two remote controls (RC1,RC2) which may overlap and thus produce a composite pulsed response. The receiver has a memory which stores the incoming pulse intervals and pulse widths, and using a microprocessor, resolves the signals into individual pulse lengths (TP1, TP2) and pulse intervals (T01,T02).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 15/00 (2006.01); H04Q 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0744723 A1 19961127; EP 0744723 B1 20000621; BR 9602416 A 19980422; BR 9602416 B1 20090113; CN 1094273 C 20021113; CN 1142145 A 19970205; FR 2734657 A1 19961129; FR 2734657 B1 19970704; JP H08340587 A 19961224; US 5870380 A 19990209

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140514

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140514

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608928

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140514

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69608928

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-03-01 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608928 20000727

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990920

1998-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON MULTIMEDIA

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1996-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT