Global Patent Index - EP 0744988 B1

EP 0744988 B1 2000-05-31 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE QUANTITY OF POLLUTANTS IN COMBUSTION EXHAUST GASES

Title (en)

DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR REDUCING THE QUANTITY OF POLLUTANTS IN COMBUSTION EXHAUST GASES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON SCHADSTOFFEN IN VERBRENNUNGSABGASEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LE VOLUME DE POLLUANTS CONTENUS DANS DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT ISSUS DE LA COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 0744988 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95906898 A

Priority

  • DE 9500128 W
  • DE 4404681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5779879A] PCT No. PCT/DE95/00128 Sec. 371 Date Jul. 24, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jul. 24, 1996 PCT Filed Feb. 2, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO95/21684 PCT Pub. Date Aug. 17, 1995An apparatus and a method for reducing harmful substances, particularly nitrogen oxides, in combustion exhaust gases in a combustion process performed with an oxygen-nitrogen-air mixture (atmosphere). At least one conduit (chamber 48) that conducts the oxygen-nitrogen-air mixture is provided and associated with an exhaust gas conduit (34) that is connected to a combustion chamber, with the conduit being provided with an intermediate wall (44) that separator the chamber is permeable to the oxygen or stores it. Of the oxygen-nitrogen-air mixture, only the oxygen is supplied to a combustion waste gas that is conducted to a combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/32; B01D 53/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2006.01); B01D 53/32 (2006.01); B01D 61/44 (2006.01); F02B 47/10 (2006.01); F02M 25/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02M 25/12 (2006.01); F02M 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 27/00 (2013.01); B01D 53/22 (2013.01); B01D 53/228 (2013.01); B01D 53/326 (2013.01); F02B 47/10 (2013.01); F02M 25/00 (2013.01); F02M 25/12 (2013.01); F02M 26/35 (2016.02); Y02T 10/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5779879 A 19980714; CN 1138833 A 19961225; DE 19528312 A1 19970206; DE 4404681 C1 19950504; EP 0744988 A1 19961204; EP 0744988 B1 20000531; JP H09508575 A 19970902; WO 9521684 A1 19950817

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030202

2002-09-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-02-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020203

2002-01-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980902

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960916

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT SE