Global patent index - EP 0745288 B1

EP 0745288 B1 2000-05-17 - PHASE-LOCKED LOOP FOR SIGNALS HAVING RECTANGULAR WAVEFORMS

Title (en)

PHASE-LOCKED LOOP FOR SIGNALS HAVING RECTANGULAR WAVEFORMS

Title (de)

PLL FÜR RECHTECKSIGNALE

Title (fr)

BOUCLE A PHASE ASSERVIE POUR SIGNAUX A FORMES D'ONDES RECTANGULAIRES

Publication

EP 0745288 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95939427 A

Priority

  • NL 9500422 W
  • NL 9402129 A
  • NL 9500491 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5710526A] PCT No. PCT/NL95/00422 Sec. 371 Date Aug. 15, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Aug. 15, 1996 PCT Filed Dec. 15, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/19043 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 20, 1996Phase-locked loop (for signals having rectangular waveforms, comprising, in series, a phase detector, a control signal generator circuit having a loop filter, a controlled oscillator and an auxiliary circuit. The detector recieves a reference signal having a reference frequency from a reference source as first input signal. The detector recieves second and third input signals from the auxiliary circuit. The reference signal and the second input signal are compared by a first logic combination function to deliver a second combination signal. The second and third input signals are compared by a second logic combination function to deliver a second combination signal. The second and third input signals are such that, in the locked state of the loop, the frequency of the second input signal is equal to the reference fequency and the frequency of the second combination signal is equal to twice the reference frequency and the duty cycle of the second combination signal differs from the duty cycle of the reference signal. The difference between the two combination signals is delivered to the control signal generator circuit. For a frequency difference between the first and second input signals of the detector, the control signal generator circuit controls the oscillator so as to set the oscillator frequency in a direction towards an extreme oscillator frequency. If the loop does not lock while traversing this path, the control signal generator circuit will adjust the loop and control the oscillator in such a way that the oscillator fequency is set in the opposite direction towards a second extreme frequency. The two extreme oscillator frequencies are chosen below and above the desired oscillator frequency, respectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03L 7/191

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03L 7/085 (2006.01); H03L 7/12 (2006.01); H03L 7/191 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03L 7/085 (2013.01); H03L 7/12 (2013.01); H03L 7/191 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5710526 A 19980120; AU 4124496 A 19960703; DE 69517016 D1 20000621; DE 69517016 T2 20000914; EP 0745288 A1 19961204; EP 0745288 B1 20000517; NL 9500491 A 19960201; WO 9619043 A1 19960620

INPADOC legal status

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090202

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061216

2005-12-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2002-12-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ERICSSON RADIO SYSTEMS B.V. TRANSFER- TELEFONAKTIE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2001-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2001-09-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517016

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990712

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE