Global patent index - EP 0745427 B1

EP 0745427 B1 2000-05-10 - Monitoring device for ball mills

Title (en)

Monitoring device for ball mills

Title (de)

Ueberwachungsvorrichtung für Kugelmühlen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance d'un broyeur à boulets

Publication

EP 0745427 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401133 A

Priority

FR 9506523 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745427A1] The grinder has a cylindrical casing containing a number of balls which, when the grinder is rotating at its nominal speed, takes up a position between two generatrices spaced by an angle between a minimal angle alphamin and a maximal angle alphamax. An amount of coal is also included which, when the grinder is rotating at its nominal speed, takes up a position between two generatrices spaced by an angle beta. An electromagnetic wave emitter is disposed inside the grinder and at least one wave receiver is disposed outside the grinder. The receiver is associated with an electronic circuit for determining at least one parameter of the grinder selected from the quantity of balls, the quantity of coal and the wear of the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 17/18; B02C 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/18 (2006.01); B02C 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 17/1805 (2013.01); B02C 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745427 A1 19961204; EP 0745427 B1 20000510; AT 192670 T 20000515; CA 2177932 A1 19961202; CN 1142988 A 19970219; DE 69608163 D1 20000615; DE 69608163 T2 20001221; DK 0745427 T3 20001002; ES 2147905 T3 20001001; FR 2734739 A1 19961206; FR 2734739 B1 19970711; US 5698797 A 19971216; ZA 9507979 B 19960418

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2003-02-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20021201

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020524

2003-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-12-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020525

2002-05-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020525

2002-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-05-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010514

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010514

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010509

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010509

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-03 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010503

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-19 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010419

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147905

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608163

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IE IT NL SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192670

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990519

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970527

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IE IT NL SE