Global Patent Index - EP 0745440 B1

EP 0745440 B1 2000-04-19 - Hot strip rolling mill plant

Title (en)

Hot strip rolling mill plant

Title (de)

Warmbandwalzanlage

Title (fr)

Train à feuillards à chaud

Publication

EP 0745440 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96108768 A

Priority

JP 13633695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745440A1] Disclosed is a hot strip mill plant for preventing a failure in biting of a plate material (1) at small diameter work rolls (3). An inlet side plate passing guide (14) and an outlet side plate passing guide (15) for guiding the plate material (1) between the work rolls (3) are provided on the inlet and outlet sides of a rolling mill. The advancing plate material (1) is deflected upward by a reaction force. Hold-down rollers (17,18) capable of being ascended/descended for preventing the floating of the plate material are provided, and thereby the plate material receives a press-in force larger than the reaction force of the work rolls (3) by the hold-down rollers (17,18). As a result, the plate material is certainly bitten between the work rolls (3). Moreover, a roll balance force or roll bending force for the work rolls is controlled upon biting of the plate material for transmitting a torque necessary for the work rolls, thereby increasing contact forces between the work rolls (3) and intermediate rolls (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 39/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/26 (2006.01); B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 27/10 (2006.01); B21B 28/04 (2006.01); B21B 29/00 (2006.01); B21B 39/14 (2006.01); B21B 39/16 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 45/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 39/16 (2013.01); B21B 1/26 (2013.01); B21B 13/023 (2013.01); B21B 13/142 (2013.01); B21B 13/147 (2013.01); B21B 45/0239 (2013.01); B21B 2269/02 (2013.01); B21B 2269/12 (2013.01); B21B 2273/08 (2013.01); B21B 2273/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745440 A1 19961204; EP 0745440 B1 20000419; DE 69607781 D1 20000525; DE 69607781 T2 20001123; JP 3067589 B2 20000717; JP H08323405 A 19961210; TW 318800 B 19971101

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20021027

2001-07-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607781 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOSHIMURA, YASUTSUGU

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAJIWARA, TOSHIYUKI

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKAKURA, YOSHIO

1999-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOT STRIP ROLLING MILL PLANT

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980505

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE