Global Patent Index - EP 0745709 B1

EP 0745709 B1 2000-05-24 - Flax fiber lint and preparation method

Title (en)

Flax fiber lint and preparation method

Title (de)

Flachfaserflocken und Aufbereitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Fibres de lin en bourre et procédé de préparation

Publication

EP 0745709 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95490033 A

Priority

FR 9506670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745709A1] The tufts of flax fibres, to be spun like cotton as a mixture mainly of linen or alone, are of 18-21 mm. The fibres shorter than 10 mm form 10-12%, and the fibres longer than 13 mm form 50% of the fibres.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 9/06; D01G 13/00; D01G 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 9/06 (2006.01); D01G 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 13/00 (2013.01); D01G 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745709 A1 19961204; EP 0745709 B1 20000524; AT 193339 T 20000615; DE 69517159 D1 20000629; FR 2734846 A1 19961206; FR 2734846 B1 19970822

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. COOPERATIVE DE *TEILLAGE DU NEUBOURG

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2002-12-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517159 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193339 T 20000615

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981117

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970602

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE GB IT NL