Global Patent Index - EP 0745725 B1

EP 0745725 B1 2000-07-26 - Roller press

Title (en)

Roller press

Title (de)

Walzenpresse

Title (fr)

Presse à rouleaux

Publication

EP 0745725 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108438 A

Priority

DE 19520443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745725A2] Roller press, calender etc. has three rollers min. forming pressure gaps to process fabric web (2) where one (3) has a very flexible casing rotating about a fixed carrier (4) on which it is mounted via at least one support element (6) with a concave surface (7) guaranteeing a broad pressure gap (1) with a counter cylinder (8). The latter forms another gap (15) with at least one flexurally non-controlled roller (14) and its casing's (9) outer circumference reduces axially from roller mid-point to ends. Also claimed is a like second roller press where the feature of the counter roller's casing is that it rotates about a fixed carrier (10) and, at its ends can not be moved against, but is mounted via at least one support element (11) on, the carrier. The elements act in a direction which, while being set at an insignificant angle, DELTA , out of the pressure plane formed with the first roller (3), is tilted w.r.t. the third roller forming the other pressure gap. Also claimed is third roller press similar to the last where the feature of the counter roller's support elements is that, along with the opposing main roller elements (6), they are so arranged and activated that the main roller exerts greater resultant compressive force in opposing that from the counter roller. Pref. the circumference of the main roller's casing and of the third roller reduces axially from roller mid-point to ends by pref. the same amount. All rollers circumferences taper off similarly to those of the preferred first press. Alternatively the counter roller's circumference does not alter. Angle DELTA is between 2 and 15, pref. 4 and 8 degrees and varies from roller mid-point to ends. All roller circumferences of taper off similarly to those of the preferred second press, angle DELTA has the same features and support elements are similarly tilted. Opposing support elements are singly, in groups or all together connected to a common pressurised fluid pipe. It is guaranteed that the main roller exerts greater compression in opposing counter roller force by fluid pressure reducing devices and the ratio of the areas of the opposing support elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 15/02 (2006.01); B30B 9/20 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01); D21F 3/0218 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01); D21F 3/045 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

PULP AND PAPER MANUFACTURE, THIRD EDITION, VOLUME 7: "Paper Machine Operations", 1991, THE JOINT TEXTBOOK COMMITTEE OF THE PAPER INDUSTRY, CANADA

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745725 A2 19961204; EP 0745725 A3 19970122; EP 0745725 B1 20000726; AT 195009 T 20000815; CA 2178020 A1 19961204; DE 19520443 A1 19961205; DE 19520443 C2 20000531; JP H0924492 A 19970128; US 5788817 A 19980804; US 5908537 A 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030528

2002-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010521

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195009

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980709

1997-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970210

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE