Global Patent Index - EP 0745731 B1

EP 0745731 B1 2000-03-01 - Deodorizing filter

Title (en)

Deodorizing filter

Title (de)

Desodorierungsfilter

Title (fr)

Filtre désodorisant

Publication

EP 0745731 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108074 A

Priority

DE 29508835 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745731A1] Odours are reduced partic. from sewage pipes with a deodorising filter having a collecting hopper (4) having a base (6) with water inlet, to which a filter housing (1) is attached contg. a removable filter cartridge (2). The cartridge pref. has a base, intermediate base, and cover, with ventilation openings, and the cartridge is attached to fixing members of the housing by a peripheral strip. Water enters a housing (9) which has an outlet (11) outside and next to the filter housing, having a valve arrangement (12), siphon or similar closure. The valve pref. comprises a rocker with flap closure on one side and wt. on the other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/08; B01D 24/04; B01D 29/085; B01D 36/00; B01D 39/00; B01D 53/04; B01D 53/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/04 (2006.01); E03F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/0404 (2013.01); E03F 5/0405 (2013.01); E03F 5/08 (2013.01); E03F 2005/0416 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508835 U1 19950928; AT 190102 T 20000315; EP 0745731 A1 19961204; EP 0745731 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070521

2006-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050521

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-06-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010517

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: OBEROSLER LUDWIG

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604518 20000406

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARIE WUBBEN CONSULTING

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190102 T 20000315

2000-02-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIRMA STOERK-KUEFERS INHABER: HANS STOERK

2000-02-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOERK-KUEFERS, PAUL

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980918

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1997-03-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL