Global Patent Index - EP 0745739 B1

EP 0745739 B1 2001-12-05 - Building block of foam mortar

Title (en)

Building block of foam mortar

Title (de)

Baustein aus Porenbeton

Title (fr)

Bloc de construction en béton cellulaire

Publication

EP 0745739 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96108350 A

Priority

DE 19519760 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745739A1] The building block (3) has, in the end faces, engagement grooves (10) running vertically when installed and extending over the entire height of the block. Handling indents (14) extending from the grooves into the block are arranged symmetrical relative to the horizontal central plane of the block. There can be one indent per end face provided through which the horizontal centre plane of the block extends or two indents per end face with one above and one below the centre plane of the block. As well as the engagement grooves a tongued and groove profile can be formed in each end face running vertically over the entire block height.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/28 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/28 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0206 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0228 (2013.01); E04B 2002/0258 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745739 A1 19961204; EP 0745739 B1 20011205; AT 210230 T 20011215; DE 19519760 A1 19961205; DE 19519760 C2 19991111

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150524

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150524

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210230 T

- Effective date: 20150524

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608338 20020117

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210230 T 20011215

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981211

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961106

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT