Global Patent Index - EP 0745756 B1

EP 0745756 B1 2000-03-22 - Fixture and method for the assembly of runner blades

Title (en)

Fixture and method for the assembly of runner blades

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Montage von Laufschaufeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode de montage d'aubes de rotor

Publication

EP 0745756 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810313 A

Priority

DE 19520274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745756A1] The tool (6) comprises a radially outer head part (8) with at least one axial groove (11b) corresponding to the axial foot of the blade (1A), and a radially inner foot part (7) for fitting into a circumferential groove (12a,12b) round the rotor (10). The blades (1) are inserted into the device and then radially into the rotor groove. All the blades are pushed together by the device into the axial grooves and then the device is removed from the groove.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/28; F01D 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/285 (2013.01); F01D 5/3007 (2013.01); F05D 2230/60 (2013.01); Y10T 29/37 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49321 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49895 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53961 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0745756 A1 19961204; EP 0745756 B1 20000322; CN 1087389 C 20020710; CN 1144877 A 19970312; DE 19520274 A1 19961205; JP H08326504 A 19961210; US 5737816 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080517

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080517

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-06-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-06-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604723 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970506

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT