Global Patent Index - EP 0745771 B1

EP 0745771 B1 2001-12-05 - Radial piston pump

Title (en)

Radial piston pump

Title (de)

Radialkolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à pistons radiaux

Publication

EP 0745771 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107585 A

Priority

DE 19517628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0745771A1] The pump has a stationary piston ring (27), retaining the pistons, radially located w.r.t. the shaft, and enclosing the eccentric. The ring has bores, open to the eccentric, for reception of the pistons. Each bore is closed at its end, away from the eccentric, by a stopper (37). The piston ring is so enclosed by the pump casing (3) that at least one liquid chamber (45) is formed between the stopper and the inside of the pump casing. Pref the liquid chamber is annular, fully surrounding the piston ring. Typically the liquid in the chamber is not pressurised, or only slightly so.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/00; F04B 1/04; F04B 1/053; F04B 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/047 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01); F04B 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/053 (2013.01); F04B 1/0443 (2013.01); F04B 1/0452 (2013.01); F04B 23/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19517628 A1 19961114; EP 0745771 A1 19961204; EP 0745771 B1 20011205; JP 4227674 B2 20090218; JP H09100776 A 19970415; US 5716198 A 19980210

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-05-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608339

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150513

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150513

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150513

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAGNA POWERTRAIN HUECKESWAGEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IXETIC HUECKESWAGEN GMBH, 42499 HUECKESWAGEN, DE

- Document: DE 59608339

- Effective date: 20140915

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59608339

- Representative's name: RAUSCH, GABRIELE, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20140915

2014-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59608339

- Representative's name: RAUSCH, GABRIELE, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020216

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608339 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990826

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970509

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT