Global Patent Index - EP 0746002 B1

EP 0746002 B1 2000-06-14 - A transformer for the measurement of current in high-voltage supply networks

Title (en)

A transformer for the measurement of current in high-voltage supply networks

Title (de)

Stromwandler für ein Hochspannungsenergieversorgungsnetz

Title (fr)

Transformateur de courant pour un réseau d'alimentation électrique à haute tension

Publication

EP 0746002 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96108463 A

Priority

IT MI951143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0746002A2] The invention concerns a transformer for the measurement of current in high-voltage networks wherein the shell (7), which compacts in the form of a ring the magnetic cores (6) of the secondary winding, is fixed in its lower part to a central metal tube (20) at the base of the transformer and in its upper part to an insulating tube (22) which centers and keeps taut said elements (22, 7, 20) resulting in advantages both with respect to the construction and for transporation. There are also provided electrodes (28,29) facing one another in order to form a preferential discharge zone in the vicinity of the safety membrane (14) as well as an intermediate shield (36) surrounding the central tube (20) and possibly, in the case of high voltages, a capacitance grading bushing (45) wound around the intermediate shield (36) for a better distribution of the electrical field. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0746002 A2 19961204; EP 0746002 A3 19970312; EP 0746002 B1 20000614; DE 69608853 D1 20000720; DE 69608853 T2 20001130; IT 1275290 B 19970805; IT MI951143 A1 19961202; IT MI951143 D0 19950601

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69608853

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150512

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150508

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010528

2000-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-08-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608853 20000720

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981221

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970418

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE