Global Patent Index - EP 0746004 B1

EP 0746004 B1 2000-11-22 - Lamp holder for a wall-mounted switch assembly and the related switch assembly

Title (en)

Lamp holder for a wall-mounted switch assembly and the related switch assembly

Title (de)

Lampenhalterung für an einer Wand befestigte Schalteinrichtung und ensprechende Schalteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Support de lampe pour dispositif de commutation monté au mûr et dispositif de commutation y relatif

Publication

EP 0746004 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201439 A

Priority

IT MI951109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0746004A1] A lamp holder for a wall-mounted switch assembly comprises an insulating block (40) which can be fitted tightly in a predetermined direction between two insulating tenons (12,13) formed by the switch body, the block acting as a support for a lamp (43) and for rheophores for connecting the lamp (43) to facing contacts (50,51,52) on two opposite walls of the block (40) which are in contact with two facing walls (48,49) of the tenons (12,13) and, by penetrating slots (53,54,55) in the tenons, ensure the electrical connection of the lamp to electrical terminals of the switch. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/16; H01H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/025 (2013.01); H01H 9/162 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0746004 A1 19961204; EP 0746004 B1 20001122; DE 69611005 D1 20001228; DE 69611005 T2 20010621; ES 2153933 T3 20010316; IT 1276348 B1 19971030; IT MI951109 A1 19961129; IT MI951109 D0 19950529

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110524

2013-06-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130605

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BTICINO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090523

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153933

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-28

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990209

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB