Global Patent Index - EP 0746058 B1

EP 0746058 B1 2000-02-09 - A shutter device for socket openings

Title (en)

A shutter device for socket openings

Title (de)

Schliessvorrichtung für Steckdosenöffnungen

Title (fr)

Obturateur pour ouvertures d'accès de prise

Publication

EP 0746058 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201438 A

Priority

IT MI951108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0746058A1] A shutter device for electrical socket openings, in particular sockets having offset openings, in which a rigid shutter element is housed between a front plate and a rear plate of the device, free to rotate about a first axis parallel to the axes of the two live openings in the socket, equidistant from and in the same plane as these, and free to oscillate about a second axis perpendicular to the said plane and intersecting the first axis. The shutter element, biased to an obstruction position by a spring, is provided with shutter arms each having an inclined plane facing one of the two "live" socket openings, and is displaced from the obstruction position by an action exerted on the inclined plane of each arm only if the action is exerted on both arms together and the shutter is in a predetermined angular position about the second axis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/453

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4532 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0746058 A1 19961204; EP 0746058 B1 20000209; DE 69606581 D1 20000316; DE 69606581 T2 20001019; ES 2143713 T3 20000516; IT 1275269 B 19970805; IT MI951108 A1 19961129; IT MI951108 D0 19950529

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140524

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120508

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143713 T3

2000-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606581 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970710

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB