Global Patent Index - EP 0746119 A3

EP 0746119 A3 2000-07-19 - Satellite communications system for transmitting information from an information centre to a satellite receiving terminal with identifier allocated to information

Title (en)

Satellite communications system for transmitting information from an information centre to a satellite receiving terminal with identifier allocated to information

Title (de)

Satellitenkommunikationsanordnung für Informationsübertragung von einer Informationszentrale zu einem Satellitenempfängerendgerät mit der Nachricht zugeordnetem Identifizierer

Title (fr)

Système de communication par satellite pour transmission d'informations d'un centre d'information à un terminal récepteur pour satellite avec identificateur alloué à l'information

Publication

EP 0746119 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96108523 A

Priority

  • JP 13173895 A
  • JP 12735696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0746119A2] To realize a system which can efficiently use a satellite communications or broadcasting channel and simply realize modes suitable for applications such as shopping, wherein the system also has a large-scale subscription. A system was configured wherein for information sent from a satellite the header of a packet is deemed as an information identifier based on the content of the information, or alternatively information having a receiving terminal identifier provided beforehand to the receiving terminal is combined with information having an information identifier based on the content of the information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/185

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/20 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); H04B 7/15 (2006.01); H04B 7/185 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 20/38 (2008.01); H04H 20/74 (2008.01); H04H 20/76 (2008.01); H04H 60/45 (2008.01); H04H 60/63 (2008.01); H04H 60/81 (2008.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04N 21/2389 (2011.01); H04N 21/647 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/17354 (2013.01); H04B 7/18526 (2013.01); H04B 7/18582 (2013.01); H04H 20/38 (2013.01); H04H 20/42 (2013.01); H04H 20/74 (2013.01); H04H 20/76 (2013.01); H04H 60/45 (2013.01); H04H 60/63 (2013.01); H04H 60/81 (2013.01); H04N 5/4401 (2013.01); H04N 5/44508 (2013.01); H04N 21/234327 (2013.01); H04N 21/2353 (2013.01); H04N 21/23617 (2013.01); H04N 21/2408 (2013.01); H04N 21/2662 (2013.01); H04N 21/4349 (2013.01); H04N 21/4351 (2013.01); H04N 21/478 (2013.01); H04N 21/6143 (2013.01); H04N 21/6193 (2013.01); H04N 21/6581 (2013.01); H04N 21/6583 (2013.01); H04H 60/06 (2013.01); H04H 60/37 (2013.01); H04H 60/65 (2013.01); H04H 2201/30 (2013.01); H04H 2201/37 (2013.01); H04N 21/47815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] US 5404505 A 19950404 - LEVINSON FRANK H [US]
  • [Y] US 5394560 A 19950228 - KANE JOHN R [US]
  • [A] EP 0537756 A2 19930421 - FUJITSU LTD [JP]
  • [X] TOSHIRO YOSHIMURA ET AL: "DATA BROADCASTING SYSTEM USING A DIRECT BROADCAST SATELLITE IN JAPAN", NHK LABORATORIES NOTE,JP,NHK TECHNICAL RESEARCH LABORATORIES. TOKYO, no. 411, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 1 - 18, XP000361028, ISSN: 0027-657X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0746119 A2 19961204; EP 0746119 A3 20000719; JP 3394388 B2 20030407; JP H0951297 A 19970218; US 5909439 A 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040223

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB