Global Patent Index - EP 0746295 A4

EP 0746295 A4 2000-05-31 - SANITARY NAPKIN HAVING A CENTRAL ACQUISITION ZONE

Title (en)

SANITARY NAPKIN HAVING A CENTRAL ACQUISITION ZONE

Title (de)

HYGIENEBINDE MIT ZENTRALER SAMMELZONE

Title (fr)

SERVIETTE HYGIENIQUE POURVUE D'UNE ZONE COLLECTRICE CENTRALE

Publication

EP 0746295 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 93916843 A

Priority

  • EP 93916843 A
  • EP 92306824 A
  • IT TO920762 A
  • US 9306179 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 13/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61F 13/20 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0746295 A1 19961211; EP 0746295 A4 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1012882

2001-08-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010531

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000905

2000-05-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 13/15 A

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950125

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE