Global Patent Index - EP 0746450 B1

EP 0746450 B1 2000-05-03 - HAND-HELD SCREWDRIVER

Title (en)

HAND-HELD SCREWDRIVER

Title (de)

HANDSCHRAUBENDREHER

Title (fr)

TOURNEVIS A MAIN

Publication

EP 0746450 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95910414 A

Priority

  • DE 9500242 W
  • DE 9403314 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9523052A1] The invention concerns a hand-held screwdriver (1) with a handle of suitable longitudinal and transverse outside dimensions, the handle consisting of an elongated hexagonal-section housing (3) with an inner space (8) designed to accommodate tool or socket-wrench heads (12) and fitted with a lid (21). The particular arrangement of the tool/socket-wrench heads and the screwdriver shaft gives a convenient tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25F 1/02 (2006.01); B25G 1/06 (2006.01); B25G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 1/02 (2013.01); B25G 1/063 (2013.01); B25G 1/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9403314 U1 19950406; DK 0746450 T3 20000828; EP 0746450 A1 19961211; EP 0746450 B1 20000503; WO 9523052 A1 19950831

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508277

- Effective date: 20130903

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROBERT SCHROEDER GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: ROBERT SCHROEDER GMBH & CO. KG#AN DER BLUTFINKE 9 A#42369 WUPPERTAL (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROBERT SCHROEDER GMBH & CO. KG#AN DER BLUTFINKE 9 A#42369 WUPPERTAL (DE)

2007-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060301

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ROBERT *SCHRODER G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-10 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030210

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508277 20000608

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT SCHROEDER GMBH & CO. KG

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT SCHROEDER GMBH & CO.

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971217

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960814

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE