Global Patent Index - EP 0746644 B1

EP 0746644 B1 2000-04-19 - Process for moving the thread in a position for changing the traveller and device therefor

Title (en)

Process for moving the thread in a position for changing the traveller and device therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bewegen des Fadens in eine Position zum Wechseln des Ringläufers, sowie Vorrichtung hierzu

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour mouvoir le fil à une position pour changer le curseur

Publication

EP 0746644 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95935796 A

Priority

  • CH 9500264 W
  • CH 388994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5794426A] PCT No. PCT/CH95/00264 Sec. 371 Date Aug. 5, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Aug. 5, 1996 PCT Filed Nov. 13, 1995 PCT Pub. No. WO96/19602 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 27, 1996A lever (30) is pivotably mounted about ax axis Z on a carrier journal (24) which is pivotable about an axis X and with which electromagnets (46, 48) cooperate. The lever carries a thread-receiving member (20) and is under the effect of a tension spring (42). When the thread is intercepted by the thread-receiving member during the forward rotation of the cop, there follows a deflection of the thread-receiving member, which takes place with the tension spring being tensioned at the same time and which is caused by the thread, on a path approximate to the movement of the traveller on the ring. The tensioned tension spring pivots the thread-receiving member during the paying-out of thread which occurs as a result of the subsequent reverse rotation of the cop. As a result of the intermediate blocking about one of the axes, the thread-receiving member moves on a path lying approximately in a tangential plane relative to the ring. Starting from the old traveller retained on the ring, the thread is stretched on a threading-in zone extending in this plane. During the attachment of the new traveller onto the ring, the thread is grasped on the threading-in zone and is thereby threaded into the ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/02 (2006.01); D01H 13/04 (2006.01); D01H 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 17/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

US 5794426 A 19980818; AT 191939 T 20000515; DE 59508199 D1 20000525; EP 0746644 A1 19961211; EP 0746644 B1 20000419; ES 2144636 T3 20000616; GR 3033963 T3 20001130; JP H09505643 A 19970603; PT 746644 E 20000731; WO 9619602 A1 19960627

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031114

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-06-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031113

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-11-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-11-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031113

2002-11-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144636 T3

2000-05-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508199 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191939 T 20000515

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR MOVING THE THREAD IN A POSITION FOR CHANGING THE TRAVELLER AND DEVICE THEREFOR

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981005

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960710

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI PT