Global Patent Index - EP 0746688 B1

EP 0746688 B1 2000-09-13 - LOW PROFILE FAN BODY WITH HEAT TRANSFER CHARACTERISTICS

Title (en)

LOW PROFILE FAN BODY WITH HEAT TRANSFER CHARACTERISTICS

Title (de)

PLATTES LÜFTERGEHÄUSE MIT WÄRMELEITENDEN CHARAKTERISTIKEN

Title (fr)

CORPS DE VENTILATEUR PLAT AVEC CARACTERISTIQUES DE TRANSFERT DE CHALEUR

Publication

EP 0746688 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93923741 A

Priority

  • US 9309266 W
  • US 96565492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5288203A] An electronic component cooling low profile fan body with favorable heat transfer characteristics is disclosed. A fan, positioned in the body, includes a number of blades circumferentially formed around a central axis. The blades establish an axial blade depth region in reference to the central axis. The low profile fan body includes a frame supporting the fan. In one embodiment of the invention, the heat transfer body includes a pressure differential surface formed around the outer perimeter of the fan blades within a first segment of the axial blade depth region. An interface surface for connection to the electronic component is positioned opposite of the fan frame. A number of heat transfer devices are disposed between the frame and the interface surface, such that the heat transfer devices are positioned within a second segment of the axial blade depth region. In an alternate embodiment of the invention, heat transfer devices are disposed between the frame and the interface surface, without a pressure differential surface, along the entire axial blade depth region. The configuration of the heat transfer devices allows them to function as both a heat transfer surface and a pressure differential surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/58; H05K 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/58 (2006.01); H01L 23/467 (2006.01); H05K 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/467 (2013.01); F04D 25/0613 (2013.01); F04D 29/526 (2013.01); F04D 29/582 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5288203 A 19940222; AT 196346 T 20000915; CA 2147752 A1 19940511; CA 2147752 C 19981208; DE 69329431 D1 20001019; DE 69329431 T2 20010222; EP 0746688 A1 19961211; EP 0746688 A4 19980513; EP 0746688 B1 20000913; JP 3400801 B2 20030428; JP H08502804 A 19960326; WO 9410451 A1 19940511

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130928

2013-10-23 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20130928

2013-10-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69329431

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69329431

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121001

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329431 20001019

2000-09-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

2000-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196346 T 20000915

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980703

1998-05-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980327

1998-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950523

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE