Global Patent Index - EP 0747131 B1

EP 0747131 B1 2001-04-25 - Pumping device for removing liquid from a container and for spraying it

Title (en)

Pumping device for removing liquid from a container and for spraying it

Title (de)

Pumpenvorrichtung zum Entnehmen einer Flüssigkeit aus einem Behälter und zu deren Zerstäubung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à pompe pour prélever un liquide dans un récipient et le distribuer sous forme pulvérisée

Publication

EP 0747131 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401227 A

Priority

FR 9506762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747131A2] The atomiser/dispenser pump consists of a pump housing (3) attached to the neck (2) of the liq. container (1), a hollow piston rod (8) which projects from the housing, and a cylindrical cap (18) with a lever-type actuator (20) connected to the upper end of the rod. The hollow rod is flexible for a part of its length from its free end (8a), and its wall thickness reduces towards the free end. The end of the rod engages with a bush (25) on the inside of the actuator which is shorter than the projecting portion of the rod, and the thickness of the bush is greater than that of the hollow rod wall at its free end. The piston and hollow rod are made from a material, esp. low-density polyethylene, which is less rigid than the material of the cap and actuator, which is esp. polypropylene or high-density polyethylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3056 (2013.01); B05B 11/3011 (2013.01); B05B 11/0062 (2013.01); B05B 11/3016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747131 A2 19961211; EP 0747131 A3 19961227; EP 0747131 B1 20010425; DE 69612587 D1 20010531; DE 69612587 T2 20020529; ES 2157411 T3 20010816; FR 2735188 A1 19961213; FR 2735188 B1 19970711; US 5975375 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070607

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060608

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060607

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-06-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-07-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157411 T3

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612587 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970120

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT