Global Patent Index - EP 0747223 B1

EP 0747223 B1 2000-09-06 - Ink reservoir with coated open-cell foam

Title (en)

Ink reservoir with coated open-cell foam

Title (de)

Tintenvorratsbehälter mit beschichtetem offenzelligem Schaumstoff

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'encre avec mousse enduite à alvéoles ouverts

Publication

EP 0747223 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304067 A

Priority

US 46909995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747223A2] A thermal ink jet printhead cartridge employs open-cell malamine-formaldehyde foam in its ink reservoir. This foam is precoated with unsubstituted polyparaxylylene or polychloroparaxylylene to immobilize loose fiber and thereby prevent nozzle blockage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175; C08G 61/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); C09D 11/00 (2006.01); C09D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747223 A2 19961211; EP 0747223 A3 19980304; EP 0747223 B1 20000906; DE 69610154 D1 20001012; DE 69610154 T2 20010412; JP H09104122 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160603

2016-06-29 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160603

2016-06-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69610154

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69610154

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990827

1998-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980805

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB