Global Patent Index - EP 0747278 B1

EP 0747278 B1 2000-04-05 - Variable-wheel-gauge bogie for rolling stock

Title (en)

Variable-wheel-gauge bogie for rolling stock

Title (de)

Drehgestell mit veränderlicher Spurweite für Eisenbahnen

Title (fr)

Bogie avec écartement variable pour matériel roulant

Publication

EP 0747278 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304135 A

Priority

  • JP 13950995 A
  • JP 13951095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747278A1] Axle sleeves (7) are axially slidably mounted on an axle (4) restrained from rotation, and a wheel (8) is supported on a bearing (8) on each axle sleeve (7). A drive motor (10) mounted on each axle sleeve (7) drives the wheel (9) for rotation. A first and a second locking projection are formed on one end portion of each axle sleeve (7), and a locking recess is formed in the inside surface of a journal box (3). The axle sleeve (7) is locked at a position for a narrow rail gauge when the first locking projection is in engagement with the locking recess of the journal box (3) or at a position for a broad rail gauge when the second locking projection is in engagement with the locking recess of the journal box (3). The first or the second locking projection is kept in engagement with the locking recess by the weight of the journal box. A conical locking projection (15A, 15B) and a locking hole (16) are kept in engagement by the weight of a truck frame. A vibration isolating unit (18) for locking projection is fitted in the locking hole (16) to hold elastically the conical locking projection (15A, 15B) as fitted in the locking hole (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60B 35/10 (2006.01); B61F 7/00 (2006.01); B61H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61H 9/00 (2013.01); B61F 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H0640335 A 19940215 - RAILWAY TECHNICAL RES INST

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747278 A1 19961211; EP 0747278 B1 20000405; AU 5473096 A 19961219; AU 719847 B2 20000518; CA 2178177 A1 19961207; CA 2178177 C 19990803; CN 1071221 C 20010919; CN 1143584 A 19970226; DE 69607518 D1 20000511; DE 69607518 T2 20000810; ES 2145384 T3 20000701; KR 100221715 B1 19991001; RU 2127684 C1 19990320; TW 355170 B 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140606

2015-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150728

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080605

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070612

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-04 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145384

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607518

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981204

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960615

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT