Global Patent Index - EP 0747462 B1

EP 0747462 B1 2000-01-12 - Fluidized bed reactor for the thermal treatment of waste materials

Title (en)

Fluidized bed reactor for the thermal treatment of waste materials

Title (de)

Wirbelbettreaktor zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfällen

Title (fr)

Réacteur à lits fluidisés pour le traitement thermique des déchets

Publication

EP 0747462 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401196 A

Priority

FR 9506707 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747462A1] Fluidised bed reactor for the heat treatment of waste and heat exchange between the circulating solids and a heat exchange device such as an evaporator and/or superheater. The reactor contains an axially circulating fluidised bed (18-18') and at least a first (28) and a second (48) dense lateral fluidised bed established along the length of a first (11) and second (12) wall of the reactor. The waste is fed in at at least one point in the first wall, above the first bed. The reactor also contains at least one extraction pipe (39) for the non-fluidisable heavy elements, located at the base of the first bed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 49/10; B01J 8/38; F22B 31/00; F23G 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10B 49/10 (2006.01); C10B 53/00 (2006.01); F22B 31/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/027 (2006.01); F23G 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 31/0084 (2013.01); C10B 49/10 (2013.01); F23G 5/0276 (2013.01); F23G 5/30 (2013.01); F23G 2201/80 (2013.01); F23G 2203/501 (2013.01); F23G 2203/503 (2013.01); F23G 2205/121 (2013.01); F23G 2205/16 (2013.01); F23G 2206/00 (2013.01); F23G 2209/102 (2013.01); F23G 2209/12 (2013.01); F23G 2209/26 (2013.01); F23G 2900/00001 (2013.01); F23G 2900/7006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747462 A1 19961211; EP 0747462 B1 20000112; AT 188726 T 20000115; CA 2196808 A1 19961219; CN 1077130 C 20020102; CN 1155897 A 19970730; CZ 9700217 A3 19970514; DE 69606093 D1 20000217; DE 69606093 T2 20000824; DK 0747462 T3 20000626; ES 2140798 T3 20000301; FR 2735041 A1 19961213; FR 2735041 B1 19970711; HU 220428 B 20020128; HU 9700364 A2 19980528; HU 9700364 A3 19991129; JP H10506985 A 19980707; PL 179698 B1 20001031; PL 318505 A1 19970623; PT 747462 E 20000428; SK 17297 A3 19970709; US 5954001 A 19990921; WO 9640837 A1 19961219

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030606

2004-04-07 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-02-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030605

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-06-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020612

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-06-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020603

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2140798 T3

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606093 20000217

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE PT SE

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188726 T 20000115

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990430

1999-06-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM ENERGY SYSTEMS S.A.

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970527

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE PT SE