Global Patent Index - EP 0747467 B1

EP 0747467 B1 2000-02-09 - Styrene-diene polymer viscosity modifiers for environmentally friendly fluids

Title (en)

Styrene-diene polymer viscosity modifiers for environmentally friendly fluids

Title (de)

Styrol/Butadien Copolymerisate als Viskositätsregler für umweltfreundliche Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Agents modificateurs de viscosité à base de copolymère de styrène et de diène pour fluides non polluants

Publication

EP 0747467 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96304157 A

Priority

US 47429595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747467A1] A composition is disclosed which comprises (A) a major amount of at least one natural oil or synthetic triglyceride of the formula <CHEM> wherein R<1>, R<2> and R<3> are aliphatic groups that contain from about 7 to about 23 carbon atoms, and (B) a minor amount of a composition comprising a hydrogenated aliphatic conjugated diene/mono-vinyl aromatic random block copolymer. In addition to components (A) and (B), the compositions may also contain (C) an oxidation inhibitor, (D) an extreme pressure/anti-wear additive or mixtures thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/044 (2013.01); C10M 2205/06 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/2835 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/401 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2207/4045 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2219/02 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2210/04 (2013.01); C10N 2210/05 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/044 + C10M 101/04 + C10M 105/38 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 133/40 + C10M 133/44 + C10M 135/02 + C10M 135/04 + C10M 135/06 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 135/36 + C10M 137/10 + C10M 143/12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747467 A1 19961211; EP 0747467 B1 20000209; AU 5456996 A 19961219; AU 720651 B2 20000608; CA 2178039 A1 19961208; DE 69606585 D1 20000316; DE 69606585 T2 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *LUBRIZOL CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050605

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2004-08-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606585

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980804

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970514

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB