Global patent index - EP 0747496 B1

EP 0747496 B1 2000-01-19 - Hot rolled steel sheet with high strength and good deep-drawing properties, containing titanium and process for its manufacturing

Title (en)

Hot rolled steel sheet with high strength and good deep-drawing properties, containing titanium and process for its manufacturing

Title (de)

Titan enthaltendes warmgewalztes, hochfestes Stahlblech mit gute Tiefziehfähigkeit, und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Tôle d'acier laminée à chaud à haute résistance et haute emboutissabilité renfermant du titane, et ses procédés de fabrication

Publication

EP 0747496 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96401006 A

Priority

FR 9506745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747496A1] Steel sheet comprises 0.5-1.5wt.% Mn, 0.01-0.1% Al and up to 0.12% C, 0.3% Si, 0.1% P, 0.05% S, 1% Cr, 0.05% Nb, also 0.03-0.15% Ti not in the form of nitrides, sulphides or oxides. The structure comprises at least 75% of ferrite hardened by precipitation of carbides or carbonitrides of Ti or of Ti and Nb, the remainder comprising at least 10% martensite and possibly bainite and austenite. Also claimed are methods of making the steel sheet by hot-rolling followed by controlled cooling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/14; C21D 8/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01); C22C 38/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/14 (2013.01); C21D 8/0426 (2013.01); C21D 8/0463 (2013.01); C21D 2211/004 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747496 A1 19961211; EP 0747496 B1 20000119; AT 189008 T 20000215; CA 2178305 A1 19961209; DE 69606227 D1 20000224; DE 69606227 T2 20000907; ES 2143725 T3 20000516; FR 2735147 A1 19961213; FR 2735147 B1 19970711; JP H08337840 A 19961224; US 5759297 A 19980602

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-09-04 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-09-04 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20020312

2002-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020516

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-03 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020503

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-05-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020430

- Year of fee payment: 07

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010509

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2001-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL GMBH

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL GMBH

2000-12-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL GMBH * 20001019 CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL GMBH

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143725

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69606227

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189008

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990623

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970104

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT LU NL SE