Global Patent Index - EP 0747524 B1

EP 0747524 B1 2000-10-25 - Basket, in particular laundry basket

Title (en)

Basket, in particular laundry basket

Title (de)

Korb, insbesondere Wäschekorb

Title (fr)

Corbeille, en particulier corbeille à linge

Publication

EP 0747524 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107989 A

Priority

DE 29508742 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747524A1] A laundry basket has a bottom (12) and a surrounding basket wall, the top end of which has an edge. The basket bottom features a curved section (32) which starts from the wall and extends in the bottom centre direction. The section (32) is raised from the bottom plane and can be used to place the basket on a person's hip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 95/00; D06F 53/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/38 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 95/002 (2013.01); B65D 1/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29508742 U1 19950921; AT 197176 T 20001115; EP 0747524 A1 19961211; EP 0747524 B1 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-11-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010520

2001-03-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606034 20001130

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2000-10-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197176 T 20001115

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990226

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970512

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT