Global Patent Index - EP 0747535 B1

EP 0747535 B1 2000-03-22 - Method for moving buildings

Title (en)

Method for moving buildings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bewegen von Bauwerken

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déplacer des bâtiments

Publication

EP 0747535 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107589 A

Priority

DE 29507608 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19611573A1] The hydraulic jacks (2) set up at points of contact (3) with a building to be moved are supplied from their own hydraulic motors (4) connected to control units (6,7) on a common data bus line (8) from the computer (9). A displacement sensor (5) is provided at each point of contact and wired to the corresponding control unit. Either of these can operate as a master unit having direct connection to the computer, with a printer (11) for easy following of the movement. Interchange of master and slave functions is possible by means of a code plug or switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 1/00; B66F 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 23/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29507608 U1 19950727; DE 19611573 A1 19961114; DE 19611573 C2 20000511; EP 0747535 A1 19961211; EP 0747535 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59604726

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BILFINGER SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BILFINGER BERGER SE, 68165 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59604726

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59604726

- Representative's name: RUECKERT, SUSANNE, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BILFINGER SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BILFINGER BERGER AG, 68165 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59604726

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59604726

- Representative's name: RUECKERT, SUSANNE, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59604726

- Representative's name: SUSANNE RUECKERT, DE

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000517

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604726 20000427

2000-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-07-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MOVING BUILDINGS

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981217

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970115

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB