Global Patent Index - EP 0747547 B1

EP 0747547 B1 2000-04-19 - Method of fabrication of a plate or the like with structural and acoustic features and plate obtained this way

Title (en)

Method of fabrication of a plate or the like with structural and acoustic features and plate obtained this way

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Tafel o.dgl. mit Bau- und Akustikeigenschaften und danach erhaltene Tafel

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un panneau ou analogue à propriétés structurale et acoustique et panneau ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 0747547 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96450012 A

Priority

FR 9507020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747547A1] Prodn. of a sandwiched panel, with structural and acoustic properties, comprising an open honeycomb structure core (1) comprises: (i) making a first and second skin (2,3) by laying up and hot pressing plies of mineral or synthetic fibre fabric impregnated with thermoplastic resin; (ii) making perforations (4) of dia. 0.5-1.5 mm covering 10-25% of the surface area of one skin; (iii) applying to one face of the skins an epoxy glue to form a sandwich with the core; and (iv) hot pressing the sandwich to cure the glue at a temp., pressure and time avoiding complete or partial obstruction of the perforated skin. Also claimed is the sandwiched panel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/86; E04C 2/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2006.01); E04C 2/36 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2013.01); E04C 2/365 (2013.01); E04B 2001/748 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24149 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24331 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747547 A1 19961211; EP 0747547 B1 20000419; CA 2178148 A1 19961209; CA 2178148 C 20080129; CN 1078844 C 20020206; CN 1141866 A 19970205; DE 69607783 D1 20000525; DE 69607783 T2 20001123; ES 2147908 T3 20001001; FR 2735166 A1 19961213; FR 2735166 B1 19970829; US 5888610 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140605

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110606

2012-07-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120717

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69607783

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100605

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100605

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-10-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: AEROSPATIALE MATRA

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147908 T3

2000-07-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AEROSPATIALE MATRA

2000-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607783 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990706

1997-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970529

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL