Global Patent Index - EP 0747553 B1

EP 0747553 B1 2000-12-13 - Door handle of motor vehicle

Title (en)

Door handle of motor vehicle

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türgriff

Title (fr)

Poignée d'un véhicule à moteur

Publication

EP 0747553 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105304 A

Priority

DE 19521082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19521082C1] The lever ends (21) with a corresponding operating force on the door grip can be displaced outwards against the force of a spring. In the inner space (3) of the door an operating part (8) coupled with at least one of the pivot levers (6) is adjusted and is connectable with a lock positioning component. The grip flap (18) is connected with the pivot levers via lever-shaped arms (20). The lever-shaped arm is pivotable around an axis (22) arranged on the pivot lever end against the rotary direction of the pivot lever into a favourable grip operating position. The basic body (2) has a guide (29) on which the lever-shaped arm rests on drawing out the grip flap from the rest position into a second end position during a predetermined pivot path section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/18 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/18 (2013.01); Y10S 292/31 (2013.01); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521082 C1 19960814; EP 0747553 A2 19961211; EP 0747553 A3 19971105; EP 0747553 B1 20001213; ES 2154360 T3 20010401; US 5632516 A 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060404

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060403

2005-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050427

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154360 T3

2001-03-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606203 20010118

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000313

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO GMBH & CO SCHLIESSSYSTEME KG

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT