Global Patent Index - EP 0747560 B1

EP 0747560 B1 2000-07-12 - Fire-resistant glazing

Title (en)

Fire-resistant glazing

Title (de)

Brandschutzverglasung

Title (fr)

Vitrage pare-feu

Publication

EP 0747560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107230 A

Priority

DE 19520562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19520562C1] In the metallic distance frame (6) an at least approx. 30 cm long metallic capillary tube (12) is arranged. One end of the tube ends in the moisture-absorbing dry medium, and its other end is fed outwards through the wall of the distance frame and through the edge seal (8) and in the installed state of the fire protection glazing is in connection with the ambient atmosphere. The capillary tube has an ID of 0.1 to 1 mm and pref. from 0.2 to 0.4 mm. The length (L) of the capillary tube is between 40 and 100 cm. The tube is made of stainless steel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16; E06B 3/677

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/677 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/165 (2013.01); A62C 2/06 (2013.01); E06B 3/677 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19520562 C1 19960814; AT 194683 T 20000715; EP 0747560 A1 19961211; EP 0747560 B1 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150508

2016-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 194683 T

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-03-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605575

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140508

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140531

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140509

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140508

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605575

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130604

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130508

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130513

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130514

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2000-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-11-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605575 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194683 T 20000715

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980930

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980930

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961010

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FI FR GB LI SE