Global Patent Index - EP 0747590 B1

EP 0747590 B1 2001-12-19 - Method and apparatus for controlling the combustion characteristics of a spark ignited combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling the combustion characteristics of a spark ignited combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Regelung des Verbrennungsablaufs bei einem Otto-Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la régulation des caractéristiques de combustion d'un moteur à allumage commande

Publication

EP 0747590 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106870 A

Priority

DE 19520605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19520605C1] Adjustments (10) which will affect the combustion in each successive cycle are made by a fuzzy or conventional PI(D) controller (9) operating on outputs taken during the preceding cycle from a stationary controller (6) of optimised ignition timing, fuel injection start and cut-off, and throttle opening, and from an operating-point characteristic memory (8) and a power and consumption calculator (7).The actual combustion function of the engine (1) is worked out by a neural net (4) and compared (5,6) with a set-point (3) and another stored characteristic (6 bis). The set-point is calculated from the measured actual condition (2) of the engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/14; F02D 37/02; F02D 41/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/02 (2013.01); F02D 35/023 (2013.01); F02D 35/028 (2013.01); F02D 41/1404 (2013.01); F02D 41/1405 (2013.01); F02D 35/027 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4318504 C1 19941027 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19520605 C1 19960523; EP 0747590 A2 19961211; EP 0747590 A3 19990203; EP 0747590 B1 20011219; US 5854990 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040502

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040502

2003-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608476 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990112

1999-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT