Global Patent Index - EP 0747913 B1

EP 0747913 B1 2000-10-04 - Surface mount electronic component with a grooved core

Title (en)

Surface mount electronic component with a grooved core

Title (de)

Oberflächenmontiertes elektronisches Bauelement mit gerilltem Kern

Title (fr)

Composant électronique à montage en surface avec noyau rainuré

Publication

EP 0747913 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96108606 A

Priority

US 46442195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0747913A1] A method for fabricating electronic components such as transformers and inductors having wire windings formed from a metal sheet rather than from manual winding of wire. Grooves (12 and 17) are formed in the surface of a core (11) during a molding process. The core (11) is then covered with an insulating layer and a metal film. Metal windings (13 and 18) are carved with one of several methods that rely on parallel grooves (12 and 17) to isolate and pattern each continuous winding. An additional embodiment describes the use of a second insulating layer (14) and a second metal film (16) to modify a component such that the component operates in re-entrant mode. This additional embodiment widens the operational bandwidth of any electronic component with at least two metal windings such as a transformer or coupled inductors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 17/06; H01F 27/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 41/08 (2006.01); H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 17/06 (2006.01); H01F 27/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 17/062 (2013.01); H01F 17/0033 (2013.01); H01F 27/362 (2013.01); H01F 2017/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0747913 A1 19961211; EP 0747913 B1 20001004; DE 69610524 D1 20001109; DE 69610524 T2 20010517; JP H08330142 A 19961213

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610524 20001109

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SURFACE MOUNT ELECTRONIC COMPONENT WITH A GROOVED CORE

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980724

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970611

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB