Global patent index - EP 0748092 A3

EP 0748092 A3 2000-11-08 - Modulation method and modulator for digital signal

Title (en)

Modulation method and modulator for digital signal

Title (de)

Modulationsverfahren und Modulation für digitales Signal

Title (fr)

Procédé de modulation et modulateur pour signal numérique

Publication

EP 0748092 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96108310 A

Priority

FI 952775 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748092A2] The invention is related to a method and modulator for modulating a digital signal to an analog intermediate-frequency signal. A baseband digital signal (I, Q) is taken to a digital-to-analog converter (71, 710) in which it is sampled at a certain sampling frequency (fin) and converted to an analog signal. The conversion produces a baseband signal (fsig) and signals (N*fin, fNi) at multiples of the sampling frequency (fin). The sampling frequency is increased, advantageously according to a sigma-delta D/A conversion, and one of the signals (N*fin, fNi) at multiples of the sampling frequency (fin), produced by the conversion, is selected as the output signal (fIF), advantageously a multiple (N*fin, fNi) of the sampling frequency that is directly at the intermediate frequency or transmission frequency. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4626803 A 19861202 - HOLM JOHN R [US]
  • [A] US 5235334 A 19930810 - MANVAR DHIRAJLAL N [US], et al
  • [A] US 5313205 A 19940517 - WILSON JAMES [US]
  • [X] EEROLA V ET AL: "SECOND-ORDER SAMPLING AND OVERSAMPLED A/D- AND D/A-CONVERTERS IN DIGITAL DATA TRANSMISSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. SYMP. 24, 11 June 1991 (1991-06-11), pages 1521 - 1524, XP000616882, ISBN: 0-7803-0050-5

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748092 A2 19961211; EP 0748092 A3 20001108; FI 952775 A0 19950606; FI 98020 B 19961213; FI 98020 C 19970325; US 5701106 A 19971223

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021009

2002-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010508

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE