Global Patent Index - EP 0748116 B1

EP 0748116 B1 2001-02-07 - television receiver

Title (en)

television receiver

Title (de)

Fernsehempfänger

Title (fr)

récepteur de télévision

Publication

EP 0748116 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96113700 A

Priority

  • EP 93118507 A
  • JP 30858692 A
  • JP 30858792 A
  • JP 2099293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0598391A2] The speaker apparatus of the invention comprises: a speaker for radiating sound waves, an acoustic pipe having a slender opening and a rectangular form, with the front opening joined to the outer wall side of a cathode-ray tube and inner wall side of a cabinet of television receiver, being disposed at the front side of the speaker, and a sound leading part composed of a hollow part surrounded between the outer wall side of the cathode-ray tube and the inner wall side of the cabinet, from the junction to the opening of the cabinet, for guiding the sound waves radiated from the acoustic pipe to the front side of the television receiver, thereby realizing acoustic reproduction of high sound quality and high sound pressure, when applied in the television receiver, in spite of small size and slim shape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/642 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0598391 A2 19940525; EP 0598391 A3 19950308; EP 0598391 B1 20010207; CN 1050491 C 20000315; CN 1089772 A 19940720; DE 69329918 D1 20010315; DE 69329918 T2 20010531; DE 69329925 D1 20010315; DE 69329925 T2 20010531; EP 0748116 A1 19961211; EP 0748116 B1 20010207; KR 0126896 B1 19971229; US 5455867 A 19951003

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071116

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071116

2006-11-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061115

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061109

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329925 20010315

2001-02-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 598391

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-12-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TELEVISION RECEIVER

1998-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971229

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960827

1996-12-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 598391

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB