Global Patent Index - EP 0748365 B1

EP 0748365 B1 2003-06-11 - OVERBASED ALKYL OXY BENZENE SULFONATES AS DETERGENTS

Title (en)

OVERBASED ALKYL OXY BENZENE SULFONATES AS DETERGENTS

Title (de)

ÜBERBASISCHE ALKYLOXYBENZOLSULFONATE ALS DETERGENTIEN

Title (fr)

SULFONATES DE BENZENE OXY ALKYLE HYPERBASIQUES UTILISES COMME DETERGENTS

Publication

EP 0748365 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95943415 A

Priority

  • US 9516162 W
  • US 36527294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9620265A1] A marine lubricating oil has a major amount of oil of lubricating viscosity; and a minor amount of an overbased, alkyl oxy benzene sulfonate having a TBN of at least 200. Between 40 wt.% and 80 wt.% of the alkyl group is attached at the 4-position and higher positions of the alkyl group. The oxy group can be hydroxy, methoxy, ethoxy, propoxy, butoxy, pentoxy, or hexoxy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 159/24; C07G 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/24 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10M 167/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 163/00 (2013.01); C10M 129/08 (2013.01); C10M 129/10 (2013.01); C10M 129/40 (2013.01); C10M 129/42 (2013.01); C10M 129/76 (2013.01); C10M 133/12 (2013.01); C10M 133/16 (2013.01); C10M 133/44 (2013.01); C10M 133/56 (2013.01); C10M 135/02 (2013.01); C10M 135/06 (2013.01); C10M 135/10 (2013.01); C10M 135/18 (2013.01); C10M 135/28 (2013.01); C10M 137/00 (2013.01); C10M 137/04 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 139/00 (2013.01); C10M 143/04 (2013.01); C10M 143/06 (2013.01); C10M 143/12 (2013.01); C10M 145/14 (2013.01); C10M 145/36 (2013.01); C10M 145/38 (2013.01); C10M 159/18 (2013.01); C10M 159/22 (2013.01); C10M 159/24 (2013.01); C10M 167/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/024 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/06 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/09 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/127 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/262 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2207/34 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01); C10M 2211/024 (2013.01); C10M 2211/044 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/062 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/223 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/02 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/086 (2013.01); C10M 2219/087 (2013.01); C10M 2219/089 (2013.01); C10M 2223/00 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10M 2227/06 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2227/062 (2013.01); C10M 2227/063 (2013.01); C10M 2227/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/066 (2013.01); C10M 2227/09 (2013.01); C10M 2229/051 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/102 (2013.01); C10N 2240/103 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 2219/046 + C10M 2219/046

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9620265 A1 19960704; CA 2184159 A1 19960704; DE 69531043 D1 20030717; DE 69531043 T2 20031204; EP 0748365 A1 19961218; EP 0748365 A4 19981216; EP 0748365 B1 20030611; JP H09511015 A 19971104

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031207

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-02-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031207

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69531043 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON ORONITE COMPANY LLC

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010910

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

1998-12-23 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10M159/24

1998-12-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1998-12-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-09-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960923

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE