Global Patent Index - EP 0748397 B1

EP 0748397 B1 2000-05-10 - SPIN-DIE MANIFOLD

Title (en)

SPIN-DIE MANIFOLD

Title (de)

SPINNBALKEN

Title (fr)

COLLECTEUR-REPARTITEUR

Publication

EP 0748397 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94924972 A

Priority

  • DE 9313586 U
  • IB 9400268 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9507378A1] The transfer of heat from the heating case (1) of a spin-die manifold to the nozzle pack carried therein (in a nozzle throat (25)) is improved in that the fixture (24) for the set is equipped with heat absorption elements (27). In operation these elements (27) are exposed to saturated steam and are provided with condensation flakes to absorb heat from the saturated steam. The absorbed heat is transferred to the nozzle pack via at least one heat bridge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/09 (2013.01); D01D 4/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9313586 U1 19931104; BR 9405584 A 19990908; CN 1052515 C 20000517; CN 1118612 A 19960313; CZ 287148 B6 20000913; CZ 9501170 A3 19950913; EP 0748397 A1 19961218; EP 0748397 B1 20000510; TW 293041 B 19961211; WO 9507378 A1 19950316

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040909

2006-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030907

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MURATA MACHINERY LTD

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-09-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030907

2003-09-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030907

2003-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NEUMAG GMBH & CO. KG

2003-05-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NEUMAG GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010207

2002-10-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MURATA MACHINERY LTD.

2002-09-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020916

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020916

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: MURATA MACHINERY LTD.

2002-05-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MURATA MACHINERY LTD.

2002-02-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RIETER AUTOMATIK GMBH TRANSFER- MURATA MACHINERY L

2001-09-05 [REG IE FD4H] REINSTATEMENT OF EUROP. PATENT DESIGNATING IRELAND PREVIOUSLY ADVERTISED AS VOID - SECTION 119(7)

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NEUMAG - NEUMUENSTERISCHE MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBA

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NEUMAG - NEUMUENSTERISCHE MASCHINEN- UND ANLAGENBA

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-04-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409342 20000615

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950307

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI LU NL