Global Patent Index - EP 0748597 B1

EP 0748597 B1 2000-08-30 - Bracelet fastener with extending buckle

Title (en)

Bracelet fastener with extending buckle

Title (de)

Faltverschluss für Armbänder

Title (fr)

Fermoir de bracelet à boucle déployante

Publication

EP 0748597 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96108907 A

Priority

FR 9507145 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0748597A1] The bracelet clasp has a base strip (1) on which can be folded down a first pivoting strip (2). The strips are joined together at one of their ends to a first pivot (3). The strips have a notch allowing their fastening together in the closed position. The notch has a first tongue (4) emerging form the base strip and a second tongue (5) emerging from the pivoting strip. Both tongues are placed back to back and head to toe for locking the strips when they are in the closed position. Both tongues are integral with the material constituting the strips and raised from this material. The second pivoting strip (6) is fastened to the base strip by a second pivot (7). This second pivoting strip and the base strip are provided with a fastening system enabling them to be fastened together in the closed position. A third tongue (8) on the base strip and a fourth tongue (9) on the second pivoting strip are placed back to back and head to toe to lock the strips in the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/00 (2006.01); A44B 11/00 (2006.01); A44C 5/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/24 (2013.01); Y10T 24/213 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2155 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4782 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0748597 A1 19961218; EP 0748597 B1 20000830; CN 1146313 A 19970402; DE 69610027 D1 20001005; DE 69610027 T2 20010405; FR 2735335 A1 19961220; FR 2735335 B1 19970801; HK 1013218 A1 20010824; JP H09314 A 19970107; SG 63649 A1 19990330; TW 372188 B 19991021; US 5689859 A 19971125

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020604

2003-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010607

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2000-11-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610027 20001005

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE SWATCH GROUP MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970618

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI